Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.
Debtor: Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.
Us Trustee: US Trustee's Office
Trustee: J. Kershaw Spong
Case Number: 3:2021bk01021
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Helen E Burris
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 64 Certificate of Service related to Order on Application to Employ Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#63). (Brimm, Christine)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order Granting Application to Employ Fuller Frost & Associates, CPA, P.C. (Related Doc #58).Notice and service of this event are delegated pursuant to the Local Rules (Richardson, R)
June 6, 2021 Filing 62 Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 06/06/2021. (Related Doc #60) (Admin.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 61 Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule AB Schedule EF Schedule G; Statements Filed: Statement of Financial AffairsStatement of Change List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims FEE REQUIRED for a Non-Individual Filed by Brianna Janine Morrison of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 List of 20 Largest Creditors #2 Schedule A/B #3 Schedule E/F #4 Schedule G #5 Schedule Statement of Financial Affairs) (Morrison, Brianna)
June 4, 2021 Filing 60 Hearing scheduled relating to: Motion for Order Waiving Requirement to Close Bank Account and Memorandum in Support Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. Document Served. (related document(s)#59) Hearing scheduled for 6/24/2021 at 10:00 AM at Columbia (HB). The case judge is Helen E. Burris. Objections due by 6/18/2021. (Lee, D)
June 4, 2021 Receipt of Filing Fee for Amended Schedules/Statements(# 21-01021-hb) [misc,amdsch] ( 32.00). Receipt Number A12615295, amount 32.00. (U.S. Treasury)
June 3, 2021 Filing 59 Motion for Order Waiving Requirement to Close Bank Account and Memorandum in Support with Certificate of Service. Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Brimm, Christine)
May 25, 2021 Filing 58 Application to Employ Fuller, Frost & Associates, CPA, P.C. as Accountant with Affidavit of Professional Filed by Brianna Janine Morrison of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morrison, Brianna)
May 20, 2021 Filing 57 SMALL BUSINESS Monthly Operating Report for April 2021 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit) (Brimm, Christine)
May 13, 2021 Filing 56 Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 05/13/2021. (Related Doc #52) (Admin.)
May 13, 2021 Filing 55 Status Conference Hearing Held. HB. (related document(s)#1) (Lee, D)
May 12, 2021 Filing 54 Certificate of Service related to Consent Order Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#53). (Brimm, Christine)
May 12, 2021 Telephonic Meeting of Creditors Held and Examination of Debtor on May 12, 2021. Filed by US Trustee's Office. (Barr, Linda)
May 11, 2021 Filing 53 Consent Order Authorizing Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral on a Final Basis and Providing Adequate Protection; filed by Debtor Regional Ambulance Service, Inc., Notice and service of this event are delegated pursuant to the Local Rules HB (related document(s)#2, #11). (Richardson, R)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order Concerning Hearing Scheduled for May 13, 2021 at 10:30 AM, will be held by telephone conference. Document Served (related document(s)#11). (Richardson, R)
May 11, 2021 Filing 51 Proposed Order RE: Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Adequate Protection Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Affidavit # 3 Proposed Order), Interim Order Authorizing Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Adequate Protection. If any party in interest shall have an objection to any of the provisions of this Interim Order or to the granting of a final order, such party shall file such objection on or before May 6,2021. If timely objections are filed, a final hearing on this matter shall be held on May 13,2021 at 10:30 AM, at the J. Bratton Davis United States Bankruptcy Courthouse, 1100 Laurel Street, Columbia, South Carolina. (Related Doc #2). Service of this Order is delegated to the Movant. Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#2, #35). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brimm, Christine)
May 7, 2021 Filing 50 Certificate of Service related to Order Setting Status Conference (Subchapter V) Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#11). (Brimm, Christine)
May 7, 2021 Filing 49 Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Deltacom/Windstream Enterprise, P.O. Box 2252, Birmingham, AL 35246-1058 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Deltacom/Windstream Enterprise, Earthlink, P.O. Box 78364, Atlanta, GA 30357 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Brimm, Christine)
May 7, 2021 Filing 48 U.S. Trustee's Statement that No Creditors Committee has been appointed. Filed by US Trustee's Office. (Stack, John)
May 3, 2021 Filing 47 Supplemental Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor In the Amount of 700.00 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Brimm, Christine)
April 30, 2021 Filing 46 Certificate of Service related to Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#45). (Brimm, Christine)
April 29, 2021 Filing 45 Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Brimm, Christine)
April 27, 2021 Filing 44 Certificate of Service related to Meeting of Creditors Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#10). (Brimm, Christine)
April 27, 2021 Filing 43 Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Workers Compensation RX Solutions, 14301 N. 87th Street, Scottsdale, AZ 85260-3686 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Workers Compensation RX Solutions, P.O. Box 654151, Dallas, TX 75265-4151 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Brimm, Christine)
April 27, 2021 Filing 42 Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Aiken County EMS, 1930 University Parkway, Suite 3200, Warrenville, SC 29851 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Aiken County EMS, 1930 University Parkway, Suite 3200, Aiken, SC 29801-2833 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Brimm, Christine)
April 27, 2021 Filing 41 Certificate of Service related to Order on Application to Employ Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#40). (Brimm, Christine)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order Granting Application to Employ of Barton Brimm, PA (Related Doc #5).Notice and service of this event are delegated pursuant to the Local Rules (Richardson, R)
April 23, 2021 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jane H. Downey of Moore Taylor Law Firm, P.A. on behalf of Henry J Abeyta. (Downey, Jane)
April 22, 2021 Filing 38 Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/22/2021. (Related Doc #27) (Admin.)
April 22, 2021 Filing 37 Certificate of Service related to Order on Chapter 11 First Day Motion, Order on Chapter 11 First Day Motion Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#36, #35). (Brimm, Christine)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Certain Pre-Petition Claims. (Related Doc #3). Service of this Order is delegated to the Movant. (Richardson, R)
April 21, 2021 Filing 35 Interim Order Authorizing Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Adequate Protection. If any party in interest shall have an objection to any of the provisions of this Interim Order or to the granting of a final order, such party shall file such objection on or before May 6,2021. If timely objections are filed, a final hearing on this matter shall be held on May 13,2021 at 10:30 AM, at the J. Bratton Davis United States Bankruptcy Courthouse, 1100 Laurel Street, Columbia, South Carolina. (Related Doc #2). Service of this Order is delegated to the Movant. (Richardson, R)
April 21, 2021 Filing 34 Proposed Order RE: Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Adequate Protection Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Affidavit # 3 Proposed Order) Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#2). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brimm, Christine)
April 21, 2021 Filing 33 Proposed Order RE: Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Certain Pre-Petition Claims and Memorandum in Support Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit a # 2 Proposed Order) Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#3). (Attachments: #1 Delegation Letter A) (Brimm, Christine)
April 21, 2021 Filing 32 Hearing Held relating to: Chapter 11 First Day Motion filed by Debtor Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#3) Order Due from Christine Brimm on 5/3/2021. (Lee, D)
April 21, 2021 Filing 31 Hearing Held relating to: Chapter 11 First Day Motion filed by Debtor Regional Ambulance Service, Inc., Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing. (related document(s)#2) Order Due from Christine Brimm on 5/3/2021. (Lee, D)
April 21, 2021 Filing 30 Proposed Order RE: Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Certain Pre-Petition Claims and Memorandum in Support Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit a # 2 Proposed Order) Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#3). (Brimm, Christine)
April 20, 2021 Filing 29 Proposed Order RE: Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Certain Pre-Petition Claims and Memorandum in Support Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit a # 2 Proposed Order) Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#3). (Brimm, Christine)
April 20, 2021 Filing 28 Proposed Order RE: Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Adequate Protection Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Affidavit # 3 Proposed Order) Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#2). (Brimm, Christine)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Concerning Hearing Scheduled for April 21, 2021 at 10:00 AM, will be held by telephone conference. Document Served (related document(s)#6). (Richardson, R)
April 20, 2021 Filing 26 Objection to Chapter 11 First Day Motion filed by Debtor Regional Ambulance Service, Inc. (Objection to Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Adequate Protection) with Certificate of Service Filed by IRS - US Attorney (related document(s)#2). (Barnett, John)
April 19, 2021 Filing 25 Objection to Chapter 11 First Day Motion filed by Debtor Regional Ambulance Service, Inc., Chapter 11 First Day Motion filed by Debtor Regional Ambulance Service, Inc. with Certificate of Service Filed by US Trustee's Office (related document(s)#3, #2). (Barr, Linda)
April 16, 2021 Filing 24 Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/16/2021. (Related Doc #11) (Admin.)
April 16, 2021 Filing 23 Certificate of Service related to Order Setting Status Conference (Subchapter V) Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#11). (Brimm, Christine)
April 16, 2021 Filing 22 Certificate of Service related to Chapter 11 First Day Motion, Chapter 11 First Day Motion, Motion to Expedite Hearing, Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#6, #3, #2, #4). (Brimm, Christine)
April 16, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Kordisha Mayers, 4932 Barrington Drive, Columbia, SC 29203 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Kordisha Mayers, 310 Ross Road, Apt. 10F, Columbia, SC 29223 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Brimm, Christine)
April 15, 2021 Filing 20 Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/15/2021. (Related Doc #8) (Admin.)
April 15, 2021 Filing 19 Certificate of Service of Meeting of Creditors Notice as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/15/2021. (Related Doc #10) (Admin.)
April 15, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Robin Armstrong, 1253 Basin Rock Lane, Lexington, SC 29073 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Robin Armstrong, 1250 Basin Road Lane, Lexington, SC 29073 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Brimm, Christine)
April 15, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Michael Close, 776 W. Martintown Road, North Augusta, SC 29841 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Michael Close, 204 Sudlow Hills Court, North Augusta, SC 29841 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Brimm, Christine)
April 15, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Daryl Leto, 379 Redds Branch Road, Aiken, SC 29801 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Daryl Leto, 454 Wheat Road, Aiken, SC 29801 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Brimm, Christine)
April 15, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: All Star Towing, 3500 Fernandina Road, Apt. E-3, Columbia, SC 29210 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: All Star Towing, 3500 Fernandina Road, Columbia, SC 29210 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Brimm, Christine)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Directing Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, to Honor Pre-Petition Payroll Checks. (Related Doc #13). Document Served. (Richardson, R)
April 15, 2021 Filing 13 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Ex Parte Relief Ordering Wells Fargo Bank, National Association to Honor Pre-Petition Payroll Checks with Certificate of Service Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Proposed Order) (Brimm, Christine)
April 14, 2021 Filing 12 Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/14/2021. (Related Doc #6) (Admin.)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting Status Conference relating to: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty) filed by Debtor Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. Document Served. (related document(s)#1). Status Conference to be held on 5/13/2021 at 10:30 AM at Columbia (HB). The case judge is Helen E. Burris. Pre-Status Report due by 4/29/2021. (Richardson, R)
April 13, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines. Document Served. Filed by US Bankruptcy Court. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/12/2021 at 09:30 AM at Columbia Meeting of Creditors. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/12/2021. Proofs of Claims due by 6/21/2021. (Stockwell, D)
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Subchapter V) Filed by US Trustee's Office. (Attachments: #1 ) Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee Regarding Disinterestedness and Proposed Compensation)(Stack, John)
April 13, 2021 Filing 8 Notice Regarding Reset of Meeting of Creditors to Telephonic Meeting of Creditors. Effective March 23, 2020 all meetings of creditors by the United States Trustee will be held telephonically on the date and time as previously noticed. No in-person meetings will be held. Please use the call-in numbers and participant codes in this notice.. (Stack, John)
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 Exhibit relating to: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty) filed by Debtor Regional Ambulance Service, Inc. (Corporate Ownership Statement) Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (related document(s)#1). (Brimm, Christine)
April 13, 2021 J. Kershaw Spong added to case. (Robinson, L)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing (Related Doc #4). Notice and service of this event are delegated pursuant to the Local Rules. Hearing scheduled for 4/21/2021 at 10:00 AM at Columbia (HB). The case judge is Helen E. Burris. (Davis, L.). Related document(s) #2 #3 . Modified on 4/13/2021, to link create linkage to Motions #2 & #3.(Richardson, R).
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 Application to Employ Barton Brimm, PA as Attorney for Debtor with Affidavit of Professional Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brimm, Christine)
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc. (related document(s)#3, #2). (Brimm, Christine)
April 12, 2021 Filing 3 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Certain Pre-Petition Claims and Memorandum in Support Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a #2 Proposed Order) (Brimm, Christine)
April 12, 2021 Filing 2 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Adequate Protection Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Affidavit #3 Proposed Order) (Brimm, Christine)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Schedules and Statements - SubchapterV Non-Individual Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Brimm, Christine)
April 12, 2021 Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty)(# 21-01021) [misc,volp11ac] (1738.00). Receipt Number A12557683, amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Regional Ambulance Service, Inc.
Represented By: Christine E Brimm
Represented By: Brianna Janine Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: US Trustee's Office
Represented By: Linda Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: J. Kershaw Spong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?