CSK Properties, LLC
Debtor: CSK Properties, LLC
Us Trustee: US Trustee
Case Number: 6:2022bk00292
Filed: February 6, 2022
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Helen E Burris
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2022 Filing 31 Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/06/2022. (Related Doc #30) (Admin.)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Granting Request to Continue 362 Motion of Regions Bank. The Matter is Continued. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by: Chief Judge Helen E. Burris, US Bankruptcy Court - District of South Carolina (related document(s)#20). Hearing scheduled for 4/19/2022 at 10:30 AM at Greenville. The case judge is Helen E. Burris. (Schmidt, R)
April 1, 2022 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Joshua J Hudson of Smith Hudson Law, LLC on behalf of Emmette Saleeby. (Hudson, Joshua)
March 28, 2022 Filing 28 Exhibit relating to: Objection filed by Debtor CSK Properties, LLC - Certification of Facts Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of CSK Properties, LLC. (related document(s)#27). (Pohl, Robert)
March 24, 2022 Filing 27 Objection to Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Regions Bank with Certificate of Service Filed by CSK Properties, LLC (related document(s)#20). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Pohl, Robert)
March 18, 2022 Filing 26 Certificate of Service RE: Order on Application to Employ. The filing party has verified that parties required to receive notice have received notice by Notice of Electronic Filing and has provided notice to other parties listed in the attached Certificate of Service. Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of CSK Properties, LLC. (related document(s)#25). (Pohl, Robert)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc #9).Notice and service of this event are delegated pursuant to the Local Rules (Henton, N)
March 18, 2022 Filing 24 Proposed Order RE: Application to Employ Robert Pohl as Attorney with Affidavit of Professional Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of CSK Properties, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Attorney # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service), Notice of Insufficient Order (related document(s)#9) Monitor deadline: 3/28/2022 (Lee, D) ** Per Chambers directives: Wrong debtor included in body of order. Please correct and resubmit. ** Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of CSK Properties, LLC. (related document(s)#9, #23). (Pohl, Robert)
March 17, 2022 Filing 23 Notice of Insufficient Order (related document(s)#9) Monitor deadline: 3/28/2022 (Lee, D) ** Per Chambers directives: Wrong debtor included in body of order. Please correct and resubmit. **
March 17, 2022 Filing 22 Calendar Removal Request re: Judge Burris on March 22, 2022 Slot no. 23 Filed by Linda Barr of Office of United States Trustee on behalf of US Trustee. (related document(s)#9). (Barr, Linda)
March 17, 2022 Filing 21 Withdrawal of Objection Reason for Withdrawal: The attorney has responded to the issues raised and made appropriate corrections. Filed by Linda Barr of Office of United States Trustee on behalf of US Trustee. (related document(s)#13). (Barr, Linda)
March 11, 2022 Filing 20 Motion for Relief from Stay with Certification of Facts, Hearing Notice and Certificate of Service RE: 4 Tracts of Real Property located at 114 Southport Road, Spartanburg, SC (TMS #6-21-14-060.00). Filed by Weyman C. Carter on behalf of Regions Bank. Date Served 3/11/2022. Last day for objections is 3/25/2022. Hearing scheduled for 4/5/2022 at 10:30 AM at Greenville. (Carter, Weyman)
March 11, 2022 Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief From Stay(# 22-00292-hb) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00). Receipt Number A12908489, amount 188.00. (U.S. Treasury)
March 11, 2022 Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief From Stay(# 22-00292-hb) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00). Receipt Number A12908489, amount 188.00. (U.S. Treasury) Modified on 3/14/2022 - AFTER REVIEW OF THE PAY.GOV REPORTS, IT WAS DETERMINED THAT THE PAYMENT WAS DOCKETED IN TRIPLICATE. THIS INFORMATION WAS CONFIRMED BY FINANCE - THERE IS ONLY ONE RECIEPT IN PAY.GOV AND THE FEE WAS PAID ONCE. RELATED DOCUMENT #20. (Surette, R).
March 4, 2022 Telephonic Meeting of Creditors Held and Examination of Debtor on March 4, 2022. Filed by US Trustee. (Barr, Linda)
March 3, 2022 Filing 19 Certificate of Service RE: Schedules/Statements Filed filed by Debtor CSK Properties, LLC, Statement of Change filed by Debtor CSK Properties, LLC. The filing party has verified that parties required to receive notice have received notice by Notice of Electronic Filing and has provided notice to other parties listed in the attached Certificate of Service. Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of CSK Properties, LLC. (related document(s)#17, #18). (Pohl, Robert)
March 3, 2022 Filing 18 Statement of Change for Previously Filed Amendment Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of CSK Properties, LLC. (related document(s)#17). (Pohl, Robert)
March 3, 2022 Filing 17 Schedules Filed: Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedule A/B Schedule D Schedule E/F Schedule G Schedule H; Statements Filed: Statement of Financial Affairs Official Form 202 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury For Non-Individual Debtors & List of Equity Security Holders -- Amended for a Non-Individual Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of CSK Properties, LLC. (Pohl, Robert)
March 2, 2022 Filing 16 Initial Debtor In Possession Report Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of CSK Properties, LLC. (Pohl, Robert)
February 27, 2022 Filing 15 Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 02/27/2022. (Related Doc #14) (Admin.)
February 25, 2022 Filing 14 Hearing scheduled relating to: Application to Employ Robert Pohl as Attorney filed by Robert A. Pohl on behalf of CSK Properties, LLC. Document Served. (related document(s)#9) Hearing scheduled for 3/22/2022 at 10:30 AM at Greenville. The case judge is Helen E. Burris. (Schmidt, R)
February 22, 2022 Filing 13 Objection to Application to Employ filed by Debtor CSK Properties, LLC with Certificate of Service Filed by US Trustee (related document(s)#9). (Barr, Linda)
February 14, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Exhibit A, Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of CSK Properties, LLC. (related document(s)#1). (Pohl, Robert)
February 9, 2022 Filing 11 Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 02/09/2022. (Related Doc #3) (Admin.)
February 9, 2022 Filing 10 Certificate of Service of Meeting of Creditors Notice as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 02/09/2022. (Related Doc #5) (Admin.)
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 Application to Employ Robert Pohl as Attorney with Affidavit of Professional Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of CSK Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Attorney #2 Proposed Order #3 Certificate of Service) (Pohl, Robert)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor In the Amount of 6800 Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of CSK Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Engagement and Fee Agreement) (Pohl, Robert)
February 7, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Weyman C. Carter on behalf of Regions Bank. (Carter, Weyman)
February 7, 2022 Filing 6 Withdrawal of Notice of Appearance Reason for Withdrawal: Original filing was on behalf of CSK Properties. Document will be re-filed on behalf of Regions Bank Filed by Weyman C. Carter on behalf of Regions Bank. (related document(s)#4). (Carter, Weyman)
February 7, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines. Document Served. Filed by US Bankruptcy Court. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/4/2022 at 09:30 AM at Greenville. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 5/3/2022. Proofs of Claims due by 6/2/2022. (DeMott, R)
February 7, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Weyman C. Carter on behalf of CSK Properties, LLC. (Carter, Weyman)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Reset of Meeting of Creditors to Telephonic Meeting of Creditors. Effective March 23, 2020 all meetings of creditors by the United States Trustee will be held telephonically on the date and time as previously noticed. No in-person meetings will be held. Please use the call-in numbers and participant codes in this notice.. (Stack, John)
February 6, 2022 Filing 2 Debtor's Request to Decline Electronic Noticing. DOCUMENT IMAGE AVAILABLE ONLY TO COURT USERS AND THE TRUSTEE/US TRUSTEE. Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of CSK Properties, LLC. (Pohl, Robert)
February 6, 2022 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Robert A. Pohl of POHL, P.A. on behalf of CSK Properties, LLC. Deadline for Filing Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement ends 08/5/2022. (Pohl, Robert)
February 6, 2022 Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty)(# 22-00292) [misc,volp11ac] (1738.00). Receipt Number A12867405, amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: CSK Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: CSK Properties, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Pohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: US Trustee
Represented By: Linda Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?