Kismet Rock Hill, LLC
Debtor: Kismet Rock Hill, LLC
Us Trustee: US Trustee's Office
Case Number: 7:2021bk01926
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Helen E Burris
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc #33).Notice and service of this event are delegated pursuant to the Local Rules (Richardson, R)
September 24, 2021 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jane H. Downey of Moore Bradley Myers Law Firm, P.A. on behalf of Bishen Singh Bedi, Surinder Singh, Veritas Sona, LLC, Ultra Aloney, LLC. (Downey, Jane)
September 15, 2021 Filing 33 Application to Employ Carin Sorvik, CPA and Newpoint Advisors Corporation as Accountant with Affidavit of Professional Filed by Brianna Janine Morrison of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morrison, Brianna)
September 13, 2021 Filing 32 Supplemental Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor In the Amount of $1,200.00 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (Brimm, Christine)
September 3, 2021 Filing 31 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: July 2021 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F #7 Exhibit G #8 Exhibit H #9 Exhibit I) (Brimm, Christine)
September 1, 2021 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard R. Gleissner of Gleissner Law Firm, LLC on behalf of Kartar Singh. (Gleissner, Richard)
September 1, 2021 Filing 29 Second Interim Consent Order Authorizing the Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral and Continuing Final Hearing. If the Lender timely objections to the use of Case Collateral on a final basis, a final hearing on this matter shall be held on October 19, 2021 at 10:30 in the Donald S Russell Federal Building, 201 Magnolia Street, Spartanburg, SC (Related Doc #6). Document Served. (Richardson, R)
September 1, 2021 Telephonic Meeting of Creditors Held and Examination of Debtor on September 1, 2021. Filed by US Trustee's Office. (Barr, Linda)
August 31, 2021 Filing 28 Proposed Order RE: Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order) Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (related document(s)#6). (Brimm, Christine)
August 24, 2021 Filing 27 Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule EF; Statements Filed: Statement of Change Declaration for Non-Individual Debtors FEE REQUIRED for a Non-Individual Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (Brimm, Christine)
August 24, 2021 Receipt of Filing Fee for Amended Schedules/Statements(# 21-01926-hb) [misc,amdsch] ( 32.00). Receipt Number A12696094, amount 32.00. (U.S. Treasury)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erno D. Lindner for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of JPMBB Commercial Mortgage Securities Trust 2014-C19, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Seri (Related Doc #25). Local Attorney: Alanna Beth Herman. Document Served. (Richardson, R)
August 18, 2021 Filing 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erno D. Lindner Local Counsel: Alanna Beth Herman Filed by Alanna B Herman of BAKER DONALSON BEARMAN on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of JPMBB Commercial Mortgage Securities Trust 2014-C19, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Seri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing #3 Supplement Supplemental Application #4 Proposed Order proposed Pro Hac Vice Order) (Herman, Alanna)
August 13, 2021 Filing 24 Schedules Filed: Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedule A/B Schedule D Schedule E/F Schedule G Schedule H; Statements Filed: Statement of Financial Affairs Certification Verifying Creditor Matrix Creditor Matrix List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Declaration About Non-Individual Debtor's Schedules for a Non-Individual Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (Brimm, Christine)
August 9, 2021 Filing 23 Certificate of Service related to Order Setting Hearing and Deadlines Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (related document(s)#17). (Brimm, Christine)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules/Statements. (Related Doc #19). Document Served. (Richardson, R)
August 6, 2021 Filing 21 Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 08/06/2021. (Related Doc #14) (Admin.)
August 6, 2021 Filing 20 Certificate of Service related to Order on Application to Employ Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (related document(s)#18). (Brimm, Christine)
August 6, 2021 Filing 19 Motion to Extend Time To File Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs and Other Filings with Certificate of Service Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (Brimm, Christine)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc #2).Notice and service of this event are delegated pursuant to the Local Rules (Richardson, R)
August 5, 2021 Filing 17 Interim Consent Order Authorizing the Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral. Document Served (related document(s)#6). Any objections are due on or before August 31, 2021. A Hearing is scheduled for 9/7/2021 at 10:30 AM at Spartanburg. The case judge is Helen E. Burris. (Richardson, R)
August 5, 2021 Filing 16 Hearing Held relating to: Chapter 11 First Day Motion filed by Debtor Kismet Rock Hill, LLC, Order Setting Hearing and Deadlines. (related document(s)#6) Without Objection Proposed Order due from Court. (Lee, D)
August 5, 2021 Filing 15 Proposed Order RE: Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order) Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (related document(s)#6). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brimm, Christine)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Concerning Hearing Scheduled to consider the Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Kismet Rock Hill, LLC.Document Served (related document(s)#10). (Richardson, R)
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 07/29/2021. (Related Doc #4) (Admin.)
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 Certificate of Service of Meeting of Creditors Notice as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 07/29/2021. (Related Doc #5) (Admin.)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Service related to Chapter 11 First Day Motion, Order Setting Hearing and Deadlines Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (related document(s)#10, #6). (Brimm, Christine)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order and Notice of Emergency Hearing on the Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Adequate Protection. Movant shall serve by 7:00 PM on July 28, 2021; Objections due on or before 1:00 PM on August 4, 2021. (related document(s)#9, #6). Hearing scheduled for 8/5/2021 at 10:30 AM at Columbia (HB). The case judge is Helen E. Burris. (Richardson, R)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC (related document(s)#6). (Brimm, Christine)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 Withdrawal of Chapter 11 First Day Motion Reason for Withdrawal: filed under wrong event Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (related document(s)#7). (Brimm, Christine)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Expedited Hearing Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (Brimm, Christine)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Proposed Order) (Brimm, Christine)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines. Document Served. Filed by US Trustee's Office. 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/1/2021 at 09:30 AM at Spartanburg. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/1/2021. Proofs of Claims due by 11/30/2021. (Montgomery, S)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Reset of Meeting of Creditors to Telephonic Meeting of Creditors. Effective March 23, 2020 all meetings of creditors by the United States Trustee will be held telephonically on the date and time as previously noticed. No in-person meetings will be held. Please use the call-in numbers and participant codes in this notice.. (Stack, John)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by Alanna B Herman of BAKER DONALSON BEARMAN on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the benefit of the registered holders of JPMBB Commercial Mortgage Securities Trust 2014-C19, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Seri. (Herman, Alanna)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Employ Barton Brimm, PA as Attorney for Debtor with Affidavit of Professional Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brimm, Christine)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Schedules and Statements - Non-Individual Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Kismet Rock Hill, LLC. Deadline for Filing Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement ends 01/19/2022. (Brimm, Christine)
July 23, 2021 Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty)(# 21-01926) [misc,volp11ac] (1738.00). Receipt Number A12666631, amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Kismet Rock Hill, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Kismet Rock Hill, LLC
Represented By: Christine E Brimm
Represented By: Brianna Janine Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: US Trustee's Office
Represented By: Linda Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?