Southern v. Asbestos Processing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lucille Southern, Odell Parker, Ruth Parker, Larry Southern and Roy Southern
Defendant: Asbestos Processing LLC, Richard H Bishoff PC, Richard H Bishoff and John M Deakle
Case Number: 0:2011cv01800
Filed: July 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER denying 473 MOTION to Alter 468 Judgment. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 08/27/2015.(bshr, )
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER granting 306 MOTION to Quash Couch Defendants' deposition notices and subpoenas to certain of Plaintiffs' trial counsel. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 01/12/2015.(bshr, )
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER re 306 MOTION to Quash Couch Defendants' deposition notices and subpoenas to certain of Plaintiffs' trial counsel, directing Brent P. Stewart, Esq. and Ann McCrowey Mickle, Esq. to submit ex parte for in camera review affidavits providing information as to the six named Plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 01/08/2015. (bshr, ). Modified on 01/08/2015 to replace document with version revising last sentence of order to indicate the affidavits should be submitted/emailed to Judge Anderson's Chambers and not filed with the Clerk(bshr, ).
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER denying 379 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 and directing Defendants to file an amended Declaration of Penny Bentley to clarify that Ms. Bentley has personal knowledge only as to the practices of certain Defendants for the period starting after February 2009. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 11/25/2014.(bshr, )
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER re 376 Hearing on 11/20/2014 at 9:30 AM, requesting parties review Professor Jon Romberg's law review article, Half a Loaf is Predominant and Superior to None: Class Certification of Particular Issues Under Rule 23(C)(4)(A), 2002 UTAH L. REV. 249 (2002), and come to Thursday's hearing prepared to discuss suggestions contained in the article. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 11/17/2014. (bshr, )
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER granting 344 Motion to Hold Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Abeyance and to Stay the Deadline for Response to the Same, holding in abeyance the Plaintiff's 334 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and staying the deadline for Defendants' response until discovery is complete. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 09/09/2014.(bshr, )
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER granting without prejudice 194 Motion to Dismiss by Tullos & Tullos, Eugene C Tullos; granting without prejudice 195 Motion to Dismiss by Barrett Law Group PA, John W Barrett; granting without prejudice 200 Moti on to Dismiss by Paul T Benton; denying 213 Motion to Dismiss by Cumbest Cumbest Hunter & McCormick, David O McCormick; granting without prejudice 224 Motion to Dismiss by Rance N Ulmer; denying 226 Motion to Dismiss by Pittman Germany Roberts & Welsh LLP, Crymes G Pittman. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 03/21/2014.(bshr, )
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER notifying parties the court will allow a brief period of jurisdictional discovery, until 01/30/2014, before ruling upon the individual motions to dismiss. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/19/2013. (bshr, )
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment, denying 90 MOTION to Unseal Document Defendants' deposition transcripts, granting 96 MOTION to Seal Document, 98 MOTION to Seal Document, 99 MOTION to Redact Transcript (ECF No. 89 ), directing defendants to to file unredacted copies of their Reply (ECF No. 95 ) and their Response in Opposition (ECF No. 97 ) using the event code Sealed Document as well as any exhibits that were submitted for in camera review in the same manner, and further directing parties to submit a proposed scheduling order to this court on or before February 13, 2013. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 02/07/2013. (bshr, )
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER directing parties to brief the court on the issue of whether the breach offiduciary duty claim could remain in this case even if the court were to find that the Plaintiffs had no viable workers' compensation claims as urged by Defendants in their motion for summary judgment. Supplement briefs due by 10/11/2012. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 09/27/2012. (bshr, )
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER clarifying 48 Scheduling Order filed May 4, 2012 and 26 Scheduling Order filed December 1, 2011 Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 6/27/12. (mflo, )
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting protection for Thomas A. Pendarvis during the period 04/10/2012 to 08/17/2012. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 04/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Pending Case)(bshr, )
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to 6 Amended Complaint. Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading due by 10/24/2011. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 09/26/2011. (bshr, ) Modified on 9/26/2011 to edit text(bshr, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern v. Asbestos Processing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Southern
Represented By: Susan F Campbell
Represented By: Steven Randall Hood
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Represented By: Ann McCrowey Mickle
Represented By: Thomas A Pendarvis
Represented By: Brent P Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odell Parker
Represented By: Susan F Campbell
Represented By: Steven Randall Hood
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Represented By: Ann McCrowey Mickle
Represented By: Thomas A Pendarvis
Represented By: Brent P Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Parker
Represented By: Susan F Campbell
Represented By: Steven Randall Hood
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Represented By: Ann McCrowey Mickle
Represented By: Thomas A Pendarvis
Represented By: Brent P Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Southern
Represented By: Susan F Campbell
Represented By: Steven Randall Hood
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Represented By: Ann McCrowey Mickle
Represented By: Thomas A Pendarvis
Represented By: Brent P Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Southern
Represented By: Susan F Campbell
Represented By: Steven Randall Hood
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Represented By: Ann McCrowey Mickle
Represented By: Thomas A Pendarvis
Represented By: Brent P Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Processing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H Bishoff PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H Bishoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Deakle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?