Fowler v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: James Fowler
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 0:2013cv01726
Filed: June 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Kershaw
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Attorney Fees per Rule 406b. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 12/10/2015.(bshr, )
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 34 Motion for Attorney Fees under EAJA, awarding attorney's fees in the amount of $4,837.50, expenses in the amount of $16.00, and costs in the amount of $7.00. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 12/30/2014.(bshr, )
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION declining to adopt 25 Report and Recommendation, remanding the action to the Commissioner for further consideration. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 09/22/2014. (bshr, )
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER the plaintiff shall have seven (7) days from the date of this order in which to file a brief. Failure to do so may result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 2/5/2014. (cwil, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fowler
Represented By: W Daniel Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?