Young v. Thomas
Petitioner: Joseph Louis Young, III
Respondent: Warden Thomas
Case Number: 0:2014cv02550
Filed: June 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Edgefield
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER AND OPINION accepting the 10 Report and Recommendation, dismissing the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus with prejudice, and denying a certificate of appealability. Signed by Honorable J. Michelle Childs on 2/17/2017. (bgoo)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting Petitioner's Motion to Amend or Alter Order and Judgment 30 , and Motion to Reopen 34 . The court thereby vacates its Order of October 1, 2014 25 and respective Judgment 26 . Petitioner will have twenty-one (21) days from the date this Order is filed to submit his objections. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/26/2015. (gmil)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT, petition is dismissed without prejudice. (gmil)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Louis Young, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?