Nautilus Insurance Company v. Crime Prevention Security Patrol LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Defendant: Crime Prevention Security Patrol LLC, Stephen Tarsitano, Thomas Tarsitano, Shaniqua T Moore and Sharetta Moore
Case Number: 0:2014cv03167
Filed: August 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: XUS, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER affirming the decisions 79 99 of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/22/2016. (bgoo)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying the 86 motion for an order of protection filed by Nautilus Insurance Company, denying the 88 motion to alter or amend filed by Gill Insurance, LLC and Kristy Dennis, and granting the 88 motion to supplement the record filed by Gill Insurance, LLC, and Kristy Dennis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 6/1/2016. (bgoo)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 57 Motion to Substitute Party. Crime Prevention Security Patrol LLC, Stephen Tarsitano, Thomas Tarsitano are terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 9/30/2015. (gmil)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER directing the pro se parties, Stephen Tarsitano and ThomasTarsitano, to keep the Clerk of Court advised, in writing, if your address changes for any reason. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 8/31/2015. (gmil)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nautilus Insurance Company v. Crime Prevention Security Patrol LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: John Robert Murphy
Represented By: Wesley Brian Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crime Prevention Security Patrol LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Tarsitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Tarsitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaniqua T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharetta Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?