Sanders v. Family Dollar Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Eric Alan Sanders
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2015cv00586
Filed: February 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER AND OPINION denying 112 Motion Relief from Final Judgment. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/9/2018.(asni, )
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER AND OPINION denying 118 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/8/2018.(asni, )
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER AND OPINION denying 107 Motion for Reconsideration re 98 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/30/2017.(asni, )
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 JUDGMENT in favor of Family Dollar Stores, Inc. against Eric Alan Sanders dismissing the complaint with prejudice. (asni, )
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER AND OPINION: The court OVERRULES Plaintiff's Objections and DENIES his 61 Appeal/Motion to Vacate the Order entered by the Magistrate Judge on February 10, 2016. The court recommits the matter to United States Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett for consideration of any remaining discovery-related issues. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/20/2016. (asni, )
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 47 MOTION to Compel. The defendant shall file an affidavit of fees and costs associated with its motion to compel by February 19, 2016. The defendant's 47 MOTION to Dismiss is held in abeyance pending Sanders's compliance with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 2/10/2016. (mwal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Family Dollar Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Alan Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?