Tucker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Alphonso Tucker
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 0:2015cv02798
Filed: July 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Charleston
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Sol Blatt
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying 86 Motion to Compel and for Default Judgment. Signed by Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 06/17/2019.(bshr, )
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 81 motion to reopen the case. Signed by Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 1/30/2018. (bgoo)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER vacating 67 Judgment, reversing the decision of the A.L.J., and remanding the case to the commissioner for further administrative proceedings on the issue of res judicata. Signed by Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 08/09/2017. (bshr, )
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 60 Report and Recommendation, granting 38 Motion to Dismiss, dismissing the plaintiff's complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Margaret B. Seymour on 11/15/2016. (bshr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphonso Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?