Williamson v. Sterling et al
Plaintiff: Dustin Robert Williamson
Defendant: Brian Sterling, Deloris Charlton, Ed Carroll and Jane or John Doe
Case Number: 0:2015cv04755
Filed: November 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 AMENDED ORDER overruling Plaintiff's objections, adopting the 166 Report and Recommendation, dismissing Plaintiff's 150 Second Amended Complaint without prejudice and without issuance and service of process, and rendering as moot all of the pending motions 149 , 159 , 160 , and 161 . Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/20/2017. (bgoo)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER adopting the 166 Report and Recommendation, dismissing Plaintiff's 150 Second Amended Complaint without prejudice and without issuance and service of process, and rendering as moot all of the pending motions 149 , 159 , 160 , and 161 . Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 6/22/2017. (bgoo)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER adopting the 138 Report and Recommendation, granting the Defendants' 79 , 80 , 81 motions for summary judgment, denying the Plaintiff's 77 motion for an injunction, and granting Plaintiff leave to amend his complaint within ten days of the filing of this Order to provide the names of the Jane and Joe Does who were allegedly personally involved in violating certain of his constitutional rights. (Amended Complaint due by 4/20/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 4/10/2017. (bgoo) Modified to edit text on 4/11/2017. (bgoo)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER allowing Williamson until October 27, 2016 to propound any additional or follow-up discovery requests to the defendants, who shall have thirty days in which to respond to such requests. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Willia mson shall file his response to the defendants' pending motions for summary judgment 79 , 80 , and 81 on or before December 12, 2016. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of the Complaint for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/13/2016. (bgoo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Sterling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Robert Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloris Charlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane or John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?