Watson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Billy Ray Watson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 0:2015cv04935
Filed: December 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Spartanburg
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Attorney Fees per Rule 406b, awarding fees in the amount of $31,159.40. Signed by Chief Judge R. Bryan Harwell on 05/21/2020.(bshr, )
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Attorney Fees, awarding $5,500.00 in attorney fees and $22.39 in expenses under the EAJA. Signed by Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 05/11/2017.(bshr, )
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION declining to adopt 16 Report and Recommendation, reversing the decision of the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and remanding the case for further administrative action. Signed by Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 02/21/2017. (bshr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Ray Watson
Represented By: Paul Townsend McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?