Evans v. York County Inc et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Evans
Defendant: York County Inc, Rock Hill Inc, City of, BH Managment, Paces River Apartment, Clifford Berinsky, Thomas I Howard, Brownlee Law Firm PLLC, Dina D Biggs, Alyssa Pruitt and Land Star Transportation Logistic Inc
Case Number: 0:2015cv04954
Filed: December 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER adopting 78 Report and Recommendation and the Plaintiff's case is summarily dismissed with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/15/17.(mflo, )
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Adopting 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 35 Amended Complaint filed by Reginald Evans. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 2/2/17. (mflo, )
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff ) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 12/29/2016. (mwal)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint by November 30, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 11/2/2016. (mwal)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 10 Report and Recommendation, dismissing the action without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 03/29/2016. (bshr, )
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Motions granted: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 1/7/2016. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. York County Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York County Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Hill Inc, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BH Managment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paces River Apartment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Berinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas I Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownlee Law Firm PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dina D Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyssa Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land Star Transportation Logistic Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?