Nutramax Laboratories Inc et al v. Manna Pro Products LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nutramax Laboratories Inc and Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences Inc
Defendant: Manna Pro Products LLC, Nutri-Vet Wellness LLC and 21st Century Animal HealthCare LLC
Case Number: 0:2016cv01255
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER AND OPINION granting 66 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 12/21/2017. (mbro, )
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER AND OPINION granting 60 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/14/2017.(asni, )
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER AND OPINION: The court ORDERS 21st Century to disgorge to Nutramax $11,130.14, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/2/2017. (asni, )
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER AND OPINION denying without prejudice 50 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 4/17/2017.(asni, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutramax Laboratories Inc et al v. Manna Pro Products LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutramax Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Richard Ashby Farrier, Jr
Represented By: Christopher Austin Jaros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences Inc
Represented By: Richard Ashby Farrier, Jr
Represented By: Christopher Austin Jaros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manna Pro Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutri-Vet Wellness LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Animal HealthCare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?