Debnam v. CB&I/WECTEC et al
Plaintiff: Russ Von'D Debnam
Defendant: CB&I/WECTEC and Global Project Services
Case Number: 0:2016cv03424
Filed: October 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: XUS, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 40 Report and Recommendation, accepting the Report and Dismissing the Complaint. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on July 29, 2021. (kbos)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER STAYING ORDER STAYING further proceedings in this action against Defendants until such time as the stay is lifted or otherwise modified. Plaintiff is directed to provide a status report every 90 days until he dismisses the case or the stay is lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 5/9/2017. (mwal) (Main Document 30 replaced on 5/9/2017) (mwal, ).
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), the court directs Plaintiff to properly serve defendants by May 15, 2017. Plaintiff's failure to properly serve and to demonstrate proper service of the summons and complaint on the defendants will result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 4/20/2017. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debnam v. CB&I/WECTEC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russ Von'D Debnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CB&I/WECTEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Project Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?