Hewitt v. Porter et al
Plaintiff: Steven Hewitt
Defendant: Abbi Porter, Doctor Coy, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 0:2017cv02874
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Georgetown
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER adopting the 23 Report and Recommendation and dismissing the action without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 4/16/2018. (bgoo)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT granting Plaintiff twenty-one (21) days from the date his order is entered to file an amended complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) that corrects the deficiencies identified in this order. (Amended Complaint due by 3/15/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 2/21/2018. (bgoo)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER dismissing the case without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/24/2018. (bgoo) (Main Document 9 replaced on 1/24/2018 with corrected scan of document.) (bgoo)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT, allowing Plaintiff fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a). (Amended Complaint due by 12/21/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/7/2017. (bgoo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewitt v. Porter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbi Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Coy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?