Johnson v. Lagtta et al

Plaintiff: Frank Stephon Johnson
Defendant: Lt. Lagtta, Lt. Lippett, Lt. Sligh, Director Myers, Capt. Higgins, Capt. Moye, Capt. Bufford, Lt. Hayes, Lt. William, Lt. Seward and Lt. Mccoullgh
Case Number: 0:2018cv00996
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION & ORDER adopting and incorporating the 58 Report and Recommendation, dismissing Officer Roach, denying Johnson's 61 motion to amend, and denying Johnson's 62 motion to appoint counsel. Signed by Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr. on 1/24/2019. (bgoo) Modified on 1/24/2019 to edit text. (bgoo)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 49 motion to amend and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Defendant Roach be dismissed. (Objections to R&R due by 1/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/28/2018. (bgoo)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, denying Plaintiff's 40 motion to amend and recommending that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Roach be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/29/2018. (bgoo)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION AND ORDER construing Johnson's 25 objections as a motion to amend the complaint and granting such motion. Johnson is granted twenty (20) days from the entry of this order to amend his complaint. It is further ordered that the case is remanded to Magistrate Judge Gossett for further proceedings. (Amended Complaint due by 8/8/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr. on 7/19/2018. (bgoo)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION & ORDER dismissing Johnson's claims against Lt. Lagtta, Lt. Lippett, Lt. Sligh, Director Myers, Capt. Higgins, Capt. Moye, Capt. Bufford, Lt. Hayes, Lt. William, Lt. Seward, and Lt. Mccoullgh with prejudice. It is further ordered that Johnson's 10 motion to amend the complaint is granted in part and denied in part. Johnson is granted twenty (20) days from the entry of this order to amend his complaint to add Officer Roach as a party. It is further ordered that the case is remanded to Magistrate Judge Gossett for further proceedings. (Amended Complaint due by 6/4/2018.) Signed by Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr. on 5/14/2018. (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Lagtta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Stephon Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Lagtta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Lippett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Sligh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Moye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Bufford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. William
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Seward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Mccoullgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?