Garrett v. Stirling et al
Plaintiff: Robert Louis Garrett, Jr.
Defendant: Bryan P. Stirling, Bernard McKie, Franklin Richardson, Donald Lane, Lefford Fate, S. Soltis, Dr. Koon, Dr. Arrojas, T. Ergen, Dr. Kocher, Dr. Sridaran, Cecilia Reynolds, Larry Cartledge, Leroy Cartledge, James Parker, B. Lewis, A. Compton, Dr. Bryne, Sharon Patterson, Kennard Dubose, Ann Hallman, C. Hindenburg, K. Rivers, P. Talbert, Barns, Curtis Earley, Florence Mauney, Amy Enloe, PREA Compliance Manager at Perry CI (2015), Lindsey Harris, Meagan Harris, Katherine Burgess, B. Roberts, Rogers, McBride, Stephon, Gina Williamson, Washington, Olds, Stephanie McMillan, Pamela Derrick, Myecha L. Miley, Brown, Sharp, Michelle Fox, Beverly Wood, V. Grubbs, Larry Morris, M. Newton, John Pate, Michael McCall, Cassandra Means, Ashley Maddox, Wilkens-Smith, McCoulough, Willie Davis, Katora Gause, Bernadette Jefferson, Unknown Person and Mr. Barkley
Case Number: 0:2018cv01309
Filed: May 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Rock Hill Office
County: Allendale
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER adopting the 314 report and recommendation, granting Defendant's 272 motion for summary judgment, and dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 1/15/2021. (mmcd)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER Plaintiff's 316 motion for extension of time to respond to Defendant's summary judgment motion is denied. Further, the Court will grant an extension for Plaintiff to file objections to the 314 report and recommendation. Plaintiff's objections are due on January 4, 2021. (Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 11/18/2020. (mmcd)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER Magistrate's Judge's 297 Order is affirmed. Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a response to Defendants' 272 motion for summary judgment no later than June 26, 2020. (Response to Motion due by 6/26/2020.) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 6/9/2020. (mmcd)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER denying Garrett's Rule 56(d) request in his 296 affidavit. Further, Garrett shall advise the court as to whether he wishes to continue with this claims and to file a response to the defendants' 272 motion f or summary judgment on or before May 29,2020. The plaintiff is further advised that if he fails to respond, his complaint will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Response to Motion due by 5/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 5/15/2020. (mmcd) Modified on 5/15/2020 to edit docket text (mmcd).
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER directing the parties to inform the court in writing of the status of this case on or before January 29, 2020 and to advise the court as to whether the case is ready for trial. (Status Report due by 1/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 1/22/2020. (mmcd)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER affirming as supplemented in this order the Magistrate Judge's 195 text order. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 7/23/2019. (bgoo)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting 215 motion for extension of time. Plaintiff shall have until August 10, 2019 to file motions to join parties, and motions to amend or supplement his complaint. Plaintiff is hereby given notice the court cannot hold this motion and case open indefinitely and will be unable to grant further exensions for this deadline. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 7/10/2019. (bgoo)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 143 184 motions and 177 supplemental documents requesting counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 5/31/2019. (bgoo)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 OPINION AND ORDER affirming the 153 order of the Magistrate Judge as supplemented in this order and allowing Plaintiff to move to amend or supplement his Complaint, with a proposed amended/supplemental Complaint attached, no later than June 25, 2019. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 5/22/2019. (bgoo)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 OPINION AND ORDER adopting 114 Report and Recommendation and denying Garrett's 106 109 motions for preliminary injunction/temporary restraining order and hearing. The Court further adopts the portions of the 113 Report and Recommendation to set aside default as to Defendants Richardson and Rogers, but declines to adopt the Report as to the dismissal of Defendant McBride. The time for service upon Defendant McBride is extended to May 15, 2019. It is further ordered that Garrett's 58 59 60 61 87 88 motions for default judgment and to seize property on Defendants Richardson and Rogers are denied, Defendant Richardson's 81 motion to set aside default is granted, and Defendant Rogers' 89 motion for extension of time to file answer is granted. This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 4/11/2019. (bgoo)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting 138 motion for extension of time. Plaintiff is hereby given notice the court cannot hold this motion and case open indefinitely, and will be unable to grant further extensions. (Objections to R&R due by 3/15/2019.) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 2/12/2019. (bgoo)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 132 motion for extension of time to file objections to the 113 114 Reports and Recommendations and terminating as moot Plaintiff's previous 130 motion for extension. (Objections to R&R due by 2/11/2019.) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 1/23/2019. (bgoo)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 126 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Objections to R&R due by 1/18/2019.) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 1/3/2019. (bgoo)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER directing each legal representative entering an appearance in this matter on behalf of any defendant to complete a Defendant's Certification and file it with the court within seven (7) days from the date of this ord er. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if any party disagrees with the court's construction of the Plaintiff's claims, he or she may file an appropriate motion with the court within seven (7) days from the date of this order. (Specific Document due by 11/23/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/16/2018. (bgoo)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying plaintiff's 66 motion to appoint counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 9/24/2018. (bgoo)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OPINION AND ORDER adopting the 10 Report and Recommendation and dismissing the following defendants from this action without prejudice and without issuance and service of process: Director Bryan P. Stirling; Bernard McKie; Donald Lane; Lefford Fate; S. Soltis; Dr. Koon; Dr. Arrojas; Dr. T. Ergen; Dr. Kocher; Dr. Sridaran; Cecilia Reynolds; Larry Cartledge; Leroy Cartledge; James Parker; Dr. B. Lewis; Dr. A. Compton; Dr. Bryne; Sharon Patterson; Kennard Dubose; Ann Hall man; C. Hindenburg; K. Rivers; P. Talbert; Barns; Curtis Earley; Florence Mauney; Amy Enloe; PREA Compliance Manager at Perry CI (2015); Lindsey Harris; Meagan Harris; Katherine Burgess; B. Roberts; Stephon; Gina Williamson; Washington; Olds; Stephan ie McMillan; Pamela Derrick; Myecha L. Miley; Brown; Sharp; Michelle Fox; Beverly Wood; V. Grubbs; Larry Morris; M. Newton; John Pate; Michael McCall; Cassandra Means; Ashley Maddox; Wilkens-Smith; McCoulough; Willie Davis; Katora Gause; Bernadette J efferson; Unknown Person who made the call to give me no pain medication the day I got out of the hospital (27 May 2016); Unknown Person who made the call not to send me to the infirmary the day I got out of the hospital 27 May 2016; Mr. Barkley. In addition, the court affirms the 11 Order of the Magistrate Judge severing cases. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 9/17/2018. (bgoo)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 15 motion for extension of time to the extent that Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from entry of this order to file anything further he wishes the court to consider as objections to the 10 Report an d Recommendation or on appeal of the Order severing the cases. (Objections to R&R due by 7/26/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 6/26/2018. (bgoo)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER finding that the above-captioned case shall pertain only to Defendants Richardson, Rogers, and McBride and directing the Clerk of Court to assign three new civil action numbers to Plaintiff to correspond with the incidents and defendants listed in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 5/24/2018. (bgoo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Stirling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Louis Garrett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan P. Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lefford Fate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Soltis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Koon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Arrojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Ergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Sridaran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecilia Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Cartledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Cartledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Bryne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennard Dubose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Hallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Hindenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence Mauney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Enloe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREA Compliance Manager at Perry CI (2015)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meagan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Derrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myecha L. Miley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Grubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Means
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilkens-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCoulough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katora Gause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Barkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?