National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Mayfield et al

Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Defendant: Arsenio Sanchez Wherry, Smith Metal & Iron Co. and Marshella Mayfield
Case Number: 0:2018cv02402
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/16/2018. (cbru, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 11/19/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/17/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/14/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/13/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/13/2019, Discovery due by 4/15/2019, Motion in Limine due by 7/26/2019, Motions due by 4/29/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/15/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 8/16/2019, Mediation Due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/16/2018. (cbru, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Arsenio Sanchez Wherry by Smith Metal & Iron Co..(Nitto, Amanda)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. (Smith Metal & Iron Co. answer due 10/19/2018) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/24/2018.(cbru, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Smith Metal & Iron Co..(Pickens, Amanda)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Smith Metal & Iron Co.. Response to Motion due by 10/4/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Pickens, Amanda)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rae Pickens on behalf of Smith Metal & Iron Co. (Pickens, Amanda)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Smith Metal & Iron Co. (cbru, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Arsenio Sanchez Wherry. (cbru, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Marshella Mayfield. (cbru, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(cbru, ) Modified to edit text on 8/30/2018 (cbru, ).
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marshella Mayfield, Smith Metal & Iron Co., Arsenio Sanchez Wherry (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7972007) filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Service due by 11/27/2018(cbru, ) Modified to edit text on 8/30/2018 (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Mayfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arsenio Sanchez Wherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Metal & Iron Co.
Represented By: Amanda Pickens Nitto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshella Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Dunn D Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?