Smith v. McGowan et al
Plaintiff: Ottis Jefferson Smith
Defendant: Neil McGowan, Eric Delaney, Melinda Haney, Jennifer Lawson, Megan Brawley Byers, John W. Sherfield, Southern Health Care Provider, Dr. Charles Dutz, John C. Anthony and Dr. N. Steed
Case Number: 0:2018cv02914
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Copies at no expense, MOTION to Substitute Party by Ottis Jefferson Smith. (Response to Motion due by 12/28/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (bgoo)
December 6, 2018 Filing 20 Letter from Ottis Jefferson Smith indicating that he will be transferred to Richland County Detention Center or Lexington County Detention Center on 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgoo)
December 5, 2018 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #18 Proper Form Order and standard prisoner complaint form placed in U.S. Mail to Ottis Jefferson Smith. Note: U.S. Mail will not run on 12/5/18 due to National Day of Mourning. (bgoo)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 12/20/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motion denied: #13 Motion for Reconsideration. Motion terminated as moot: #13 Motion to Amend. Charles Dutz, N. Steed, Megan Brawley Byers, Southern Health Care Provider, John C. Anthony and John W. Sherfield added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/5/2018. (bgoo)
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address and Letter advising Court of guilty plea and appeal in State Court by Ottis Jefferson Smith (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (bgoo)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #10 Proper Form Order denying motion to appoint counsel, MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint by Ottis Jefferson Smith. (Response to Motion due by 12/12/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents - Statement of the Claim, #2 Envelope) Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (bgoo)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT by Ottis Jefferson Smith to #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (bgoo)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #10 Proper Form Order, summons, and Four Forms USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail to Ottis Jefferson Smith (bgoo)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 12/11/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motion granted: #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Motion denied: #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/20/2018. (bgoo)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT by Ottis Jefferson Smith to #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (bgoo)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 Letter from Ottis Jefferson Smith. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (bgoo)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ottis Jefferson Smith. Response to Motion due by 11/9/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (bgoo)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Ottis Jefferson Smith. Response to Motion due by 11/9/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (bgoo)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ottis Jefferson Smith. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (bgoo) Supplement filed on 11/15/2018 at #9 . (bgoo) Supplement filed on 11/26/2018 at #12 . (bgoo)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to assign a separate civil action number for this plaintiff. Signed by Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 10/26/2018. (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. McGowan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Brawley Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Sherfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Care Provider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Charles Dutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. N. Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ottis Jefferson Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?