Nueman v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Latressa Nueman
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2018cv03045
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: South Carolina District Court
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2019 11 SPECIALIZED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Joint Stipulation Deadline 4/24/2019) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 1/2/2019. (cbru, )
December 27, 2018 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Hawk, John)
November 23, 2018 9 Supplemental Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Hawk, John)
November 20, 2018 8 TEXT ORDER: Defendant's response to Local Civil Rule Interrogatory 26.01(C) filed as ECF No. #7 is incomplete. This party is directed to file a complete response to all subparts of the inquiry within three business days of entry of this order. (Supplement due by 11/28/2018) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 11/20/2018. (cbru, )
November 20, 2018 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Hawk, John)
November 20, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Latressa Nueman. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 DoI Letter and Greencard)(Alderson, Ryan) Modified to edit text on 11/20/2018 (cbru, ).
November 20, 2018 5 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company answer due 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Extension Confirmation)(Hawk, John)
November 9, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (cbru, )
November 9, 2018 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Latressa Nueman.(cbru, )
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8100267) filed by Latressa Nueman. Service due by 2/7/2019(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nueman v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: John Chrisman Hawk, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latressa Nueman
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?