Victoria Development Group LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank NA

Plaintiff: Victoria Development Group LLC
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 0:2018cv03242
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: South Carolina District Court
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, February 5, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in chambers of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Matters to be taken up at the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 1/17/19. (mflo, )
January 16, 2019 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank NA.(Hawk, John)
December 10, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victoria Development Group LLC. Wells Fargo Bank NA served on 12/6/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Certified Mail Receipt, Wells Fargo)(Maxfield, David)
December 7, 2018 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wells Fargo Bank NA.(Hawk, John)
December 7, 2018 6 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Wells Fargo Bank NA answer due 1/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Extension Confirmation)(Hawk, John)
December 3, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank NA. (mflo, )
November 30, 2018 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Victoria Development Group LLC.(mflo, )
November 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank NA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8135719.), filed by Victoria Development Group LLC. Service due by 2/28/2019(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victoria Development Group LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Development Group LLC
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Shelton Sterling Laney, III
Represented By: John Chrisman Hawk, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?