APL MICROSCOPIC, LLC v. 4LIFE INTERNATIONAL

Plaintiff: APL MICROSCOPIC, LLC
Defendant: 4LIFE INTERNATIONAL
Case Number: 0:2018cv03449
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/7/2019.(cbru, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joel Benjamin Rothman ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8194813) by APL MICROSCOPIC, LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application/Affidavit for Pro hac Vice Admission of Joel B. Rothman, #2 Exhibit Joel Rothman Court and Bar Admissions, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Joel B. Rothman)No proposed order.(Freeman, Hunter)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright placed in U.S. Mail to Register of Copyrights (cbru, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (cbru, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to 4LIFE INTERNATIONAL. (cbru, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by APL MICROSCOPIC, LLC.(cbru, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 4LIFE INTERNATIONAL (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8161100) filed by APL MICROSCOPIC, LLC. Service due by 3/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Web Page, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cease and Desist Letters)(cbru, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/17/2018) (cbru, ). Modified to add descriptions to attachments on 12/17/2018 (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APL MICROSCOPIC, LLC v. 4LIFE INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APL MICROSCOPIC, LLC
Represented By: Hunter S Freeman
Represented By: Joel B Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4LIFE INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?