White v. Wilkes
Petitioner: Elijah Jerome White
Respondent: Custody of BOP Alston Wilkes
Case Number: 0:2019cv00568
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #12 Judgment, #11 Order on Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail to Elijah Jerome White (bgoo)
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT dismissing the action without prejudice. (bgoo)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER affirming #7 Report and Recommendation, dismissing petition without prejudice and without requiring respondent to file a return. It is further ordered that a certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/22/2019.(eric, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendation by Elijah Jerome White. Reply to Objections due by 4/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (bgoo)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #6 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, served on US Attorney General on 4/2/2019. (bgoo)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #6 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail to Elijah Jerome White and #6 Order with copy of habeas petition sent via certified mail to the U.S. Attorney General (Article No. 7018 2290 0001 5720 0028). (bgoo)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the #1 Petition be dismissed without prejudice and without requiring the respondent to file a return. Objections to R&R due by 4/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 3/27/2019. (bgoo)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 3/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Habeas Petition) (bgoo)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Elijah Jerome White (bgoo)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number SCX200016181 (bgoo)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Elijah Jerome White. (bgoo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2019: #1 Memo in Support) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Custody of BOP Alston Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elijah Jerome White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?