Brady v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Misty Pavlinchak Brady
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record
Case Number: 0:2019cv01837
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Misty Pavlinchak Brady. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 7/5/2019, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service green cards)(McDaniel, Christi)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is reminded that she is responsible for service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(1) unless she provides the court with completed USM-285 forms so that service can be effected by the U.S. Marshals Service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). If service is not effected within 90 days, this action will be recommended for dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m). Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 7/15/2019. (kkus, ) Modified on 7/15/2019 to add text(bshr, ).
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 8 Reason: filed in error by filer. (lsut, )
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett. Signed by Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. on 06/28/2019. (bshr, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Misty Pavlinchak Brady. (bshr, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bshr, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Misty Pavlinchak Brady. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(bshr, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Misty Pavlinchak Brady. Service due by 9/25/2019(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brady v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Pavlinchak Brady
Represented By: Christi Barfield McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?