Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Scottie Williams
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record
Case Number: 0:2019cv01905
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 7/15/2019. (kkus, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scottie Williams. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 7/5/2019, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Mayes, W)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bshr, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Scottie Williams. Response to Motion due by 7/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(bshr, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Scottie Williams. Service due by 10/1/2019(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottie Williams
Represented By: W Daniel Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?