Brown v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Pamela Brown
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 0:2019cv01940
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel W Bax on behalf of Pamela Brown (Bax, Nathaniel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERJoint Stipulation Deadline 12/16/2019. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 8/26/2019. (mdea )
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Quattlebaum, James)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Quattlebaum, James)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Prudential Insurance Company of America answer due 8/23/2019. (Quattlebaum, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Brown. Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 DoI Letter and Greencard)(Alderson, Ryan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America. (cbru, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pamela Brown.(cbru, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8547401) filed by Pamela Brown. Service due by 10/8/2019(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: James Derrick Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Brown
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Alderson
Represented By: Nathaniel W Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?