Cottingham v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Patrick D Cottingham
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record
Case Number: 0:2019cv01947
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick D Cottingham. Patrick D Cottingham served on 7/16/2019, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certified Receipts)(Gallagher, Hannah)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is reminded that he is responsible for service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(1) unless he provides the court with completed USM-285 forms so that service can be effected by the U.S. Marshals Service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). If service is not effected within 90 days, this action will be recommended for dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m). Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 7/15/2019. (kkus, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bshr, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Patrick D Cottingham. Response to Motion due by 7/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(bshr, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Patrick D Cottingham. Service due by 10/8/2019(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cottingham v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick D Cottingham
Represented By: Hannah Voth Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?