Gateway Commerical Finance LLC v. GITI Tire Manufacturing USA LTD
Plaintiff: Gateway Commerical Finance LLC
Defendant: GITI Tire Manufacturing USA LTD
Case Number: 0:2019cv02541
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Report by Gateway Commerical Finance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Discovery Plan, #2 Supporting Documents Mediation Certification)(Palmer, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/22/2019.(asni, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jared A. Ullman ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8733951) by Gateway Commerical Finance LLC. Response to Motion due by 11/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Supporting Documents Motion in Support of PHV App)No proposed order.(Palmer, Elizabeth)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 3/26/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/4/2019. (asni, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/24/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/7/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 11/7/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/18/2020, Discovery due by 3/19/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5/1/2020, Motions due by 4/2/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/1/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/2/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/4/2019. (asni, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by GITI Tire Manufacturing USA LTD.(Outten, Samuel)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by GITI Tire Manufacturing USA LTD.(Outten, Samuel)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by GITI Tire Manufacturing USA LTD.(Outten, Samuel)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gateway Commerical Finance LLC. GITI Tire Manufacturing USA LTD served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Palmer, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gateway Commerical Finance LLC.(asni, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GITI Tire Manufacturing USA LTD. (asni, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GITI Tire Manufacturing USA LTD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8659339.), filed by Gateway Commerical Finance LLC. Service due by 12/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A MPSA, #2 Exhibit B UCC, #3 Exhibit C NOA, #4 Exhibit D Invoice)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gateway Commerical Finance LLC v. GITI Tire Manufacturing USA LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GITI Tire Manufacturing USA LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gateway Commerical Finance LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth J Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?