Reid v. Lancaster School District
Plaintiff: Collette Reid
Defendant: Lancaster School District
Case Number: 0:2019cv03012
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #15 Order Service - Non-Inmate placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Collette Reid 1780 Lillywood Lane Indianland, SC 29707 (mmcd)
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Lancaster School District. Service due by 3/3/2020 (mmcd)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/3/19. (mmcd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #10 Proper Form Order and Form USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Collette Reid, 1780 Lillywood Lane, Indianland, SC 29707 (bgoo)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 12/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motion granted: #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/13/2019. (bgoo)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Collette Reid. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgoo)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Collette Reid. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgoo)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Collette Reid. Response to Motion due by 11/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (bgoo)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lancaster School District, filed by Collette Reid. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Lancaster School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collette Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?