Culp v. Town of Ridgeway et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Culp
Defendant: Town of Ridgeway, Rufus Jones, Heath Cookendorfer and Dan Martin
Case Number: 0:2019cv03519
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Christopher Culp.(Dickey, Joseph)
December 21, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Heath Cookendorfer, Rufus Jones, Dan Martin, Town of Ridgeway.(Williams, Fred)
December 21, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Heath Cookendorfer, Rufus Jones, Dan Martin, Town of Ridgeway.(Williams, Fred)
December 21, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Heath Cookendorfer, Rufus Jones, Dan Martin, Town of Ridgeway.(Williams, Fred)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Christopher Culp.(Dickey, Joseph)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/9/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/23/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 1/23/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/13/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/16/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/15/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/15/2020, Discovery due by 6/15/2020, Motions due by 8/14/2020, Mediation Due by 7/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/19/2019. (hada, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Heath Cookendorfer, Rufus Jones, Dan Martin, Town of Ridgeway.(hada, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Heath Cookendorfer, Rufus Jones, Dan Martin, Town of Ridgeway.(hada, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fairfield County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019CP2000323. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8835506), filed by Christopher Culp. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 State Court Documents)(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culp v. Town of Ridgeway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Ridgeway
Represented By: D L Dirk Aydlette, III
Represented By: Fred Adam Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rufus Jones
Represented By: D L Dirk Aydlette, III
Represented By: Fred Adam Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Cookendorfer
Represented By: D L Dirk Aydlette, III
Represented By: Fred Adam Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Martin
Represented By: D L Dirk Aydlette, III
Represented By: Fred Adam Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Culp
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Dickey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?