American National Property and Casualty Company v. Wylie
Plaintiff: American National Property and Casualty Company
Defendant: Christian C Wylie
Case Number: 0:2020cv02672
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/23/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/7/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 10/7/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/2/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/1/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/31/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/2/2021, Discovery due by 5/19/2021, Motions due by 6/3/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/2/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 8/2/2021, Mediation Due by 7/2/2021, Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on September 3, 2020. (kbos)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Counterclaim #6 by American National Property and Casualty Company.(Hanna, George)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Christian C Wylie.(Dumas, Brian)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Christian C Wylie.(Dumas, Brian)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by American National Property and Casualty Company. Christian C Wylie served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hanna, George)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American National Property and Casualty Company.(kbos)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Christian C Wylie. (kbos)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christian C Wylie ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9225151.), filed by American National Property and Casualty Company. Service due by 10/15/2020(kbos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American National Property and Casualty Company v. Wylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American National Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Ian Silverberg
Represented By: George V Hanna, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian C Wylie
Represented By: Brian T Grier
Represented By: Brian Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?