Beaver v. Fairfield County
Plaintiff: Vinson Beaver
Defendant: Fairfield County
Case Number: 0:2020cv04032
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
2 Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Sherri A Lydon. Judge Honorable J Michelle Childs no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Fairfield County.(Williams, Fred)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Fairfield County.(Williams, Fred)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Fairfield County.(Williams, Fred)
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Vinson Beaver.(Albrecht, Samantha)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Vinson Beaver.(Albrecht, Samantha)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Report due by 12/29/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/22/2021, Discovery due by 6/21/2021, Motions due by 7/6/2021, and Mediation Due by 9/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/23/2020. (mmcd)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Fairfield County.(Williams, Fred)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fairfield County. (mmcd)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fairfield County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-20-00354. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9482612), filed by Fairfield County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (mmcd) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/23/2020) (cbru, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/23/2020) (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaver v. Fairfield County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield County
Represented By: Fred Adam Williams
Represented By: Thomas Foster Haselden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinson Beaver
Represented By: Samantha Elenor Albrecht
Represented By: Elizabeth Salley Millender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?