United States of America v. Spencer
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Keith R. Spencer
Case Number: 0:2021cv00538
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 4/22/2021. (cbru, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 5/26/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/21/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/21/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/20/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/20/2021, Discovery due by 10/19/2021, Motion in Limine due by 2/1/2022, Motions due by 11/3/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/18/2022, Bench Trial Deadline 2/22/2022, Mediation Due by 1/3/2022. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 4/22/2021. (cbru, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Keith R. Spencer.(Robins, Matthew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Keith R. Spencer.(Alphin, John)
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by United States of America. Keith R. Spencer waiver executed on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Service of Summons)(Sneed, Robert) Modified to edit text on 3/17/2021 (cbru, ).
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Keith R. Spencer. (cbru, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(cbru, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/23/2021) (cbru, ).
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keith R. Spencer (Filing fee waived) filed by United States of America. Service due by 5/24/2021(cbru, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/23/2021) (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith R. Spencer
Represented By: Matthew Brian Robins
Represented By: John Randall Alphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert M Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?