Cornwell v. Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority et al
Plaintiff: Sha'neka Cornwell
Defendant: Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority doing business as Atrium Pineville and South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, LLC doing business as CVS Store # 4288
Case Number: 0:2021cv01117
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 21 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/22/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/19/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/16/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/16/2022, Discovery due by 4/12/2022, Motion in Limine due by 8/15/2022, Motions due by 4/29/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/5/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 9/6/2022, ADR Statement due by 5/23/2022, Mediation Due by 6/20/2022. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 6/11/2021. (cbru, )
June 3, 2021 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority.(Todd, Monteith)
June 1, 2021 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Sha'neka Cornwell.(McGowan, Chad) Modified to edit text on 6/1/2021 (cbru, ).
June 1, 2021 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff and Defendant Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority have failed to comply with the Conference and Scheduling Order (Dkt No. #7 ) by failing to file Responses to Local Rule 26.03 Interrogatories in conjunction with the Rule 26(f) Report by May 28, 2021. Counsel shall file the required responses to interrogatories within ten calendar days of the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order will result in the imposition of sanctions, which may, without further notice, include dismissal of the action without prejudice, exclusion of some or all defenses, or a monetary sanction not to exceed $500. (Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories due by 6/11/2021) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 6/1/2021. (cbru, )
May 28, 2021 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, LLC.(Clement, James)
May 28, 2021 Filing 16 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, LLC.(Clement, James)
May 28, 2021 Filing 15 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Clement, James)
May 18, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Clement, James)
May 7, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Reply due by 5/18/2021) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 5/7/2021.(cbru, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/21/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Clement, James) Modified to link correct event to associated event on 5/7/2021 (cbru, ).
May 4, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Sha'neka Cornwell.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/11/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Calloway, Jordan)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Christopher Calloway on behalf of Sha'neka Cornwell (Calloway, Jordan) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/4/2021) (cbru, ).
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority.(Todd, Monteith)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority.(Todd, Monteith)
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 5/28/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/22/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/19/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/16/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/16/2021, Discovery due by 11/12/2021, Motion in Limine due by 3/14/2022, Motions due by 11/29/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/3/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 4/4/2022, ADR Statement due by 12/23/2021, Mediation Due by 1/20/2022. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 4/23/2021. (cbru, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/6/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Clement, James)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sha'neka Cornwell.(McGowan, Chad) Modified to edit text on 4/19/2021 (cbru, ).
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, LLC re #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #1 Notice of Removal (cbru, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, LLC.(cbru, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-46-00851 (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-9778205) filed by South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornwell v. Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority doing business as Atrium Pineville
Represented By: Monteith Powell Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, LLC doing business as CVS Store # 4288
Represented By: James Whittington Clement
Represented By: Molly Hood Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sha'neka Cornwell
Represented By: Chad A McGowan
Represented By: Jordan Christopher Calloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?