Cheatham v. Sanders et al
Plaintiff: Freddie Cheatham
Defendant: Michael Privette, Jimmy Blessing, Donald Johnson and Marcus Sanders
Case Number: 0:2021cv01778
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED 8 Clerk's notice and #7 Order to Notify of Address Change placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Freddie Cheatham 4546 Broad River Road Columbia, SC 29210. (mmcd)
June 25, 2021 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Freddie Cheatham 4546 Broad River Road Columbia, SC 29210. (mmcd)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this action be summarily dismissed without prejudice and without issuance and service of process for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fe.d. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 6/24/2021. (mmcd)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice - #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis addressed in #7 order. (mmcd)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes and granting Plaintiff's #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 6/24/2021. (mmcd)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (mmcd)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Freddie Cheatham. Response to Motion due by 6/28/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 state court motion to proceed in forma pauperis, #2 Envelope)Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (mmcd)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Freddie Cheatham. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (mmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheatham v. Sanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Privette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Blessing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Cheatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?