Ramey v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Anthony Paul Ramey
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record and US Attorney - Social Security Noticing
Case Number: 0:2021cv02990
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Proper Form Order with copy of #1 Complaint Form placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Anthony Paul Ramey, 726 Two Notch Road, Lot 7, Lexinigton, SC 29073. (bshr, )
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Case to be brought into proper form by 11/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/13/2021. (bshr, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 4 Set Answer Deadline - Social Security Complaint placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Anthony Paul Ramey, 726 Two Notch Road, Lot 7, Lexinigton, SC 29073 (bshr, )
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Standing Order 3:21-mc-00212-RBH signed by Chief Judge R. Bryan Harwell, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Set Answer Deadline - Social Security Complaint: Answer due from Commissioner of Social Security Administration on 3/16/2022 (bshr, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Anthony Paul Ramey. Response to Motion due by 9/30/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(bshr, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Anthony Paul Ramey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Order of Appeals Council)(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramey v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Paul Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Attorney - Social Security Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?