Bullock v. Mendoza et al
Petitioner: Kevin Elwood Bullock
Respondent: A. Mendoza and FCI - Williamsburg
Case Number: 0:2021cv03205
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 15 OBJECTION to #11 Report and Recommendation by Kevin Elwood Bullock. Reply to Objections due by 12/13/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (dist)
November 18, 2021 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED NEF of #10 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer and NEF of #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Mailed from Columbia Clerks Office to Kevin Elwood Bullock, 21534-057, FCI Williamsburg, PO Box 390, Salters, SC 29590. (dist)
November 16, 2021 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #10 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Kevin Elwood Bullock, 21534-057, FCI Williamsburg, PO Box 390, Salters, SC 29590. #10 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer sent via certified mail (receipt no. 7017-1450-0001-4670-1776) to US Attorney General, Department of Justice, Room B-103, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20530-0001. (dist)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the Petition be dismissed without prejudice and without requiring the respondent to file a return. Objections to R&R due by 11/29/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/12/2021. (dist) Modified on 11/18/2021 to correct signature date. (dist)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Habeas Petition) Filing corrected for event type. (dist) Modified on 11/16/2021 to correct document number. (dist) Modified on 11/18/2021 to correct signature date. (dist)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number SCX00095900 (dist)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #4 Proper Form Order and IFP Application placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Kevin Elwood Bullock, 21534-057, FCI Williamsburg, PO Box 390, Salters, SC 29590. (lbak)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 11/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 10/13/2021. (lbak)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (mmcd)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kevin Elwood Bullock. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (mmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullock v. Mendoza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Elwood Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A. Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI - Williamsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?