Reeves v. South Carolina, State of
Petitioner: Phillip C Reeves and Phillip Charles Reeves
Respondent: South Carolina, State of and Director, Greenville County Detention Center
Case Number: 0:2022cv04616
Filed: December 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Referring Judge: Paige J Gossett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (County)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2023 Filing 28 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #27 Judgment, #26 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Phillip C Reeves, 1079/214985, Greenville County Det. Center, 20 McGee St. Greenville, SC 29601. (dist)
February 15, 2023 Filing 27 JUDGMENT dismissing the action without prejudice. (dist)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER adopting the #16 Report and Recommendation, denying as moot Petitioner's #18 #22 #25 motions, dismissing this matter without prejudice and without requiring Respondent to file a return and denying a certificate of appealability. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 2/15/2023. (dist) (Main Document 26 replaced on 2/15/2023 with corrected document) (dist).
February 6, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION to add Ground Five "Prejudice Inadequate Mailroom" by Phillip C Reeves. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(dist)
February 6, 2023 Filing 24 Letter from Phillip Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dist)
February 6, 2023 Filing 23 OBJECTION to #16 Report and Recommendation by Phillip C Reeves. Reply to Objections due by 2/21/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (dist)
February 6, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Make Addendum's to Ground's (1 through 4) by Phillip C Reeves. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope 1, #4 Envelope 2)(dist)
February 3, 2023 Filing 21 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #14 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, Petition served on South Carolina Attorney General's Office on 2/1/2023. (dist)
February 3, 2023 Filing 20 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #14 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, Petition served on Director Greenville County Detention Center on 2/1/2023. (dist)
February 2, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Prosecutorial Misconduct by Phillip C Reeves. Response to Motion due by 2/16/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dist)
January 30, 2023 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 15 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #14 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Phillip C Reeves 1079/214985 Greenville County Det. Center 20 McGee St. Greenville, SC 29601. #14 Order and Habeas Petition sent via certified mail to Warden, Greenville County Detention Center, article # 7017 1450 0001 4670 2001 and to South Carolina Attorney General's Office # 7017 1450 0001 4670 1981. (dist)
January 27, 2023 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the instant #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus be dismissed without prejudice and without requiring the Respondent to file a return. Objections to R&R due by 2/10/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 1/27/2023. (dist)
January 27, 2023 Filing 15 Clerk's Notice: #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis addressed in #14 .(dist)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address., Director, Greenville County Detention Center added. South Carolina, State of terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 1/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Habeas Petition)(dist)
January 9, 2023 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT by Phillip C Reeves to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(dist)
January 9, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Phillip C Reeves. Response to Motion due by 1/23/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett.(dist)
December 22, 2022 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #5 Proper Form Order and IFP Application placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Phillip C Reeves, 1079/214985, Greenville County Det. Center, 20 McGee St., Greenville, SC 29601. (lbak)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 1/12/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/22/2022. (lbak)
December 21, 2022 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenville. (lbak)
December 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Phillip C Reeves. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (lbak)
December 21, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Phillip C Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (lbak) Supplement added on 1/09/2023 at #12 .(dist).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeves v. South Carolina, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Phillip C Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Phillip Charles Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: South Carolina, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, Greenville County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?