James v. Scarborough et al
Plaintiff: Anthony James
Defendant: Wonda Scarborough, Anthony J Padula and Warden of Lee Correctional Inst
Case Number: 1:2010cv02794
Filed: October 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting 129 Motion for Confidentiality Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 2/6/2012.(abuc)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The court adopts Magistrate Judge Hodges' Report and Recommendation. It is therefore ORDERED that Scarborough's motion for summary judgment 71 is denied except to the extent Scarborough is sued for monetary damages in her official capacity it is granted. It is further ORDERED that James' motion for summary judgment 96 is denied. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 12/5/2011. (mcot, )
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: It is ordered that Plaintiff's 24 motion to compel be granted and the following motions be denied: (1) Plaintiff 79 Motions to Compel; (2) Plaintiff's 35 , 43 , and 50 Motions for Subpoenas; (3) Plaint iffs 36 Motion for a Physical and Mental Examination; (4) Plaintiff's 41 Motion for and Extension of time to Complete Discovery and for Sanctions; (5)Plaintiff's 76 Motion to Transfer to Charleston County Detention Center; and (6) Plaintiff's 81 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 11/10/2011.(sste )
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER. Counsel for Defendant is directed to indicate to the court by November 8, 2011, by a filing on the docket, whether he can accept service of process on behalf of Defendant or whether Defendant will waive service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 10/26/2011. (mcot, )
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The court adopts Magistrate Judge Hodges' Report and Recommendation and incorporates it herein. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for an entry of default 15 is denied. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 4/19/2011. (mcot, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Scarborough et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wonda Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J Padula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of Lee Correctional Inst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?