Chestnut v. Singleton
Plaintiff: Raymond Edward Chestnut
Defendant: K Singleton
Case Number: 1:2013cv02250
Filed: August 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Marlboro
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. (mwal)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying 64 MOTION to Compel; denying 65 MOTION to Compel; denying 66 MOTION for Physical Examination; denying 67 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum; denying 74 MOTION for Sanctions; den ying 78 MOTION for Entry of Default; denying 79 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Raymond Chestnut; denying 83 MOTION for Sanctions; denying 88 MOTION for Spoilation Sanctions; and denying 90 MOTION for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 4/13/2015. (mwal)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying 58 Motion for Copies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 9/12/2014.(abuc)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ADOPTING 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 19 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by K Singleton. It is ordered that Defendant's motion for summary judgment is denied without prejudice to the right to refile at a later time. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 8/20/2014. (abuc)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 37 Motion for Discovery; denying 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 41 Motion for Polygraph Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 8/4/2014.(abuc) Modified to correct file date on 8/5/2014 (abuc).
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 22 Report and Recommendation. The Court recommits the matter back to the Magistrate Judge with instructions. The Magistrate Judge should give Defendant thirty (30) days in which to file with the Court the video evi dence referred in Plaintiff's Documentation of Informal Resolution Attempt, if any such evidence exists and if they wish to make it a part of the record. The Plaintiff should also be given an additional thirty (30) days to submit any further evi dence in response to Defendant's motion. If Defendant produces the video, the Magistrate Judge should review it and re-evaluate the matter, and should submit another Report and Recommendation upon review of any additional filings by the parties. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 4/8/2014. (abuc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chestnut v. Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Edward Chestnut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?