Bryant v. Byars et al

Petitioner: James N Bryant, III
Respondent: William R Byars and Alan Wilson
Case Number: 1:2013cv02665
Filed: September 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Abbeville
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 JUDGMENT accepting in part the US Magistrate's Report and Recommendation, granting in part Respondents' motion for summary judgment, granting in part Petitioner's amended petition and vacating the death sentence. (lbak)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER accepting in part 86 Report and Recommendation, granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion for Summary Judgment, dismissing grounds three and ten of the 65 amended petition as moot, and vacating the death sentence. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 3/19/2019. (lbak)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER LIFTING STAY Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 10/13/2017. (bgoo)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 11/22/2013.(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Byars et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James N Bryant, III
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Franklin-Best
Represented By: Marta K Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William R Byars
Represented By: Alphonso Simon, Jr
Represented By: Samuel Creighton Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alan Wilson
Represented By: Alphonso Simon, Jr
Represented By: Samuel Creighton Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?