Smith v. Greenwood County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Wayne Michael Smith
Defendant: Linda Middleton, Greenwood County Detention Center and Tony Davis
Case Number: 1:2014cv01113
Filed: March 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Greenwood
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 JUDGMENT/ The court has ordered that this action is dismissed without prejudice as to Greenwood County Detention Center, and with prejudice as to Linda Middleton and Tony Davis. (mwal)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tony Davis, Linda Middleton. Plaintiff has failed to respond to the motion. As such, it appears to the court that he does not oppose the motion and wishes to aba ndon this action. Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff is directed to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment by November 21, 2014. Plaintiff is further advised that if he fails to respond, this action will be recommended for dismissal with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 11/7/2014. (abuc)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The defendant, Greenwood County Detention Center, is dismissed without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/9/2014. (abuc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Greenwood County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwood County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?