McDaniels v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Wayne McDaniels
Defendant: Chuck Wright, Tim Tucker, Phil Easler, Barry Barnette, Robert B Hall, Durham Cole, Alan Wilson, Leah Moody, Kevin Owens and South Carolina Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2014cv03728
Filed: September 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Spartanburg
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 39 motion requesting reconsideration or relief of the Order dismissing this case. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L. Wooten on 11/17/2017. (bgoo)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 30 MOTION for Reimbursement of Funds in the amount of $11.03 for PLRA fee. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 12/23/2015. (mwal)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGMENT in favor of South Carolina Department of Corrections, Alan Wilson, Barry Barnette, Chuck Wright, Durham Cole, Kevin Owens, Leah Moody, Phil Easler, Robert B Hall, Tim Tucker against Kevin Wayne McDaniels. (mwal)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER adopting 10 Report and Recommendation. Motions denied: 18 MOTION for Reimbursement of Funds, 13 MOTION to Waive Filing Fee, 16 MOTION to Reopen Case, 15 MOTION for Judgment of Acquittal Based Upon Fact ual Innocence and Fundamental Miscarriage of Justice, 19 MOTION for Reimbursement of Funds in the amount of $350.00 for Filing Fee. The Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 1/12/2015. (mwal)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Motion granted: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) filed by Kevin Wayne McDaniels. Motion denied: 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Kevin Wayne McDaniels. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 9/30/2014. (abuc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniels v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Wayne McDaniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Easler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Barnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert B Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durham Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?