McDaniels v. South Carolina, State of
Plaintiff: Kevin Wayne McDaniels
Defendant: South Carolina, State of, Alan Wilson, Nikki Haley, Derham Cole, Barry Barnette, Chuck Wright, Tim Tucker, Phil Easler and Robert Hall
Case Number: 1:2014cv04197
Filed: October 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Spartanburg
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 37 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L. Wooten on 11/17/2017. (bgoo)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT in favor of South Carolina, State of, Alan Wilson, Barry Barnette, Chuck Wright, Derham Cole, Nikki Haley, Phil Easler, Robert Hall, Tim Tucker against Kevin Wayne McDaniels. (mwal)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER accepting 19 Report and Recommendation, denying 11 MOTION for Release of Funds, denying 24 MOTION not to be charged filing fees and to be reimbursed for filing fees already paid based upon factual innocent of t he crime itself, denying 22 MOTION to Not be Charged the Filing Fee, terminating as moot 13 MOTION to appoint FBI to Assist Plaintiff, denying as futile 23 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, terminating as moot 14 MOTION for Service, terminating as moot 12 MOTION for Recusal. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 1/12/2015. (mwal)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350. Motion granted: 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) filed by Kevin Wayne McDaniels. Motion denied: 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Kevin Wayne McDaniels. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 11/20/2014. (abuc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniels v. South Carolina, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Wayne McDaniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derham Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Barnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Easler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?