Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Larissa A Smith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2014cv04400
Filed: November 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Attorney Fees per Rule 406b, awarding fees in the amount of $5,628.34. Signed by Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 03/13/2017.(bshr, )
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA, denying plaintiff's request for attorney's fees and expenses, granting plaintiff's request for costs in the amount of $407.00. Signed by Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 12/21/2016.(bshr, )
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION rejecting 16 Report and Recommendation, reversing the decision of the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and remanding the case to the Commissioner with instructions that the Commissioner reevaluate the severity of Plaintiff's fibromyalgia and how it affects her residual functional capacity. Signed by Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 03/21/2016. (bshr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larissa A Smith
Represented By: W Daniel Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?