Addison v. Catoe
Plaintiff: Kelvin Sharod Addison
Defendant: Danny Catoe
Case Number: 1:2015cv00572
Filed: February 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Kershaw
Presiding Judge: Sol Blatt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JUDGMENT dismissing the case without prejudice. (gmil)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION dismissing the 1 Complaint without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Transcripts is denied. Signed by Honorable Sol Blatt, Jr on 5/14/2015. (gmil)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350. Motions granted: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) filed by Kelvin Sharod Addison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 2/27/2015. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison v. Catoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Sharod Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Catoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?