Rodgers v. Glenn et al
Plaintiff: Ricky M Rodgers
Defendant: FNU Glenn, Ivan Negron, Albert Crosby, Jeffrey Eiben, D Garcia, FNU Hood and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2016cv00016
Filed: January 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Hampton
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER adopting in part and declining to adopt in part 56 Report and Recommendation; granting Defendants' 25 Motion to Dismiss; denying Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Amend Complaint; dismissing Plaintiff's FTCA claims without prejudice; and dismissing Plaintiff's other claims with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/20/2017. (mwal)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: In an abundance of caution, the Clerk mailed the 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Plaintiff's new address on February 16, 20017. Plaintiff may file objections to the Report and Recommendation by March 7, 2017. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 2/21/2017. (mwal)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT 35 ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION The Court declines to adopt the R & R. Plaintiff is directed to file his response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by October 21,2016. If Plaintiff fi les a response by this deadline, the Court will recommit the matter to the Magistrate Judge to address the merits of Defendant's motion for summary judgment. (Dkt. No. 25). But if Plaintiff fails to respond by October 21, 2016, the Court will dismiss Plaintiffs case with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 09/19/2016. (egra, )
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER directing Plaintiff to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Defendants' 25 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment by August 25, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 8/11/2016. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers v. Glenn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky M Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Negron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Eiben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?