York v. Cartledge et al
Plaintiff: Herbert Demond York
Defendant: Larry Cartledge, A. Young and Micheal McCall
Case Number: 1:2016cv03971
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Kershaw
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice. (mwal)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER adopting 67 Report and Recommendation and dismissing the action without prejudice for lack of prosecution under Rule 41(b). Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/4/2018. (mwal)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER directing Plaintiff to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Defendants' 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment by December 15, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 12/1/2017. (mwal)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 39 MOTION to Stop Retaliation from Prison Officials as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 9/26/2017. (mwal)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: York v. Cartledge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Demond York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Cartledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?