Fuqua v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Earl W Fuqua
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2017cv00699
Filed: March 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Charleston
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED ORDER granting 17 Motion for Attorney Fees, awarding $4,250.00 in attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Honorable J. Michelle Childs on 01/26/2018. (bshr, )
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Attorney Fees, awarding $4,250.00 in attorney's fees and expenses. Signed by Honorable J. Michelle Childs on 01/25/2018.(bshr, )
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 11 Report and Recommendation, reversing the decision of the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and remanding the matter for further administrative action. Signed by Honorable J. Michelle Childs on 11/27/2017. (bshr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuqua v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl W Fuqua
Represented By: Osborne Eugene Powell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?