Knowles v. Aiken, City of

Plaintiff: Lance Knowles
Defendant: Aiken, City of
Case Number: 1:2018cv02100
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
County: Aiken
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Filing 12 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/30/2018. (cbru, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 10/3/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/29/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/27/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/27/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/27/2018, Discovery due by 2/25/2019, Motion in Limine due by 6/10/2019, Motions due by 3/12/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/28/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 7/1/2019, Mediation Due by 5/13/2019. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/30/2018. (cbru, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Aiken, City of.(Plyler, Daniel)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Aiken, City of.(Plyler, Daniel)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Lance Knowles. Aiken, City of served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/28/2018. (Few, Wesley) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/10/2018) (cbru, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2018: #1 Signed Acceptance of Service) (cbru, ).
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright placed in U.S. Mail to Register of Copyrights (cbru, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (cbru, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aiken, City of. (cbru, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lance Knowles.(cbru, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aiken, City of (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7916146) filed by Lance Knowles. Service due by 10/29/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Instagram Photograph, Romantic Walks with Santa Claus, posted by Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Aiken is Magical web-site showing Plaintiff's Photograph, #3 Exhibit B-2 - screenshot - Defendant's Aiken is Magical web-site showing Plaintiff's Photograph, #4 Exhibit C - Defendant's FaceBook Visit Aiken SC - showing Plaintiff's Photograph, #5 Exhibit D - Defendant's Insatgram @VisitAikenSC - showing Plaintiff's Photograph, #6 Exhibit E - screenshot - Defendant's Blast e-mail - showing Plaintiff's Photograph, #7 Exhibit F - Copyright Registration No. VA 2-109-584, entitled Romantic Walks with Santa Clause)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowles v. Aiken, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Knowles
Represented By: Wesley D Few
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aiken, City of
Represented By: Daniel C Plyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?